NC S498 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-24 - Ch. SL 2009-161
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-24 - Ch. SL 2009-161
Summary
Affordable Housing for Teachers/Edgecombe Co.
Title
Affordable Housing for Teachers/Edgecombe Co.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-24 | Ch. SL 2009-161 | |
2009-06-24 | Ratified | |
2009-06-23 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2009 | |
2009-06-22 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-06-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2009 | |
2009-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-11 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H531 (Same As) 2011-03-31 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S498 |