NC S525 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Critical Access Behavioral Health Agencies
Title
Critical Access Behavioral Health Agencies
Sponsors
Sen. Austin Allran [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Thomas Goolsby [R] | Sen. Richard Gunn [R] |
Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] | Sen. Eldon Newton [R] | Sen. Louis Pate [R] | Sen. William Rabon [R] |
Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-171 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-27 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-27 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-20 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-30 | Re-ref Com On Health and Human Services | |
2012-05-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-19 | Ref To Com On Appropriations | |
2011-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Mental Health & Youth Services | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H618 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-253