NC S572 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Ch. SL 2019-232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Ch. SL 2019-232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
University System Risk Management Provisions
Title
University System Risk Management Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-10 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | Ch. SL 2019-232 | |
2019-10-18 | Signed by Gov. 10/18/2019 | |
2019-10-15 | Pres. To Gov. 10/15/2019 | |
2019-10-14 | Ratified | |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/10/2019 |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-10-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-10-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/02/2019 |
2019-10-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-10-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-07-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-13 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Filed |