NC S581 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish Historical Boilers Licensing Act
Title
Establish Historical Boilers Licensing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-07-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-07-22 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Stricken |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed |