NC S600 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-439
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-439
Summary
Condemnation of Conservation Easements.
Title
Condemnation of Conservation Easements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Ch. SL 2009-439 | |
2009-08-07 | Signed By Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Ratified | |
2009-07-29 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-27 | Placed On Cal For 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-27 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-06-04 | Re-ref Com On Environment and Natural Resources | |
2009-06-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-12 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-16 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1080 (Same As) 2009-04-06 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Appropriations
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S600 |