NC S600 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appraiser Compensation/Judge Perform Marriage
Title
Appraiser Compensation/Judge Perform Marriage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - A1 Brawley Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - A1 Brawley Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-61 | |
2016-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 06/27/2016 | |
2016-06-27 | Ratified | |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2016 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2016 |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-21 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-21 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-21 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016 |
2016-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Banking |
2016-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |