NC S602 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Domestic Fowl Stray/Commercial Poultry Lands
Title
Domestic Fowl Stray/Commercial Poultry Lands
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A1 Haire\Second Reading\M3 To Lay On\The Table (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A1 Haire\Second Reading\M3 To Lay On\The Table (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-313 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Tabled 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-23 | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-05-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-17 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-19 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Filed |