NC S612 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Government
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Government
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulatory Reform Act of 2013
Title
Regulatory Reform Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] |
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Shirley Randleman [R] | Sen. Daniel Soucek [R] |
Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Government |
2014-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-07 | House | Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-02 | Engrossed | |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed |