NC S622 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary II
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary II
Summary
Undertaking to Stay Money Judgment.
Title
Undertaking to Stay Money Judgment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-17 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-16 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S622 |