NC S636 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Foster Care Rates/Funds
Title
Increase Foster Care Rates/Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Kathryn Harrington [R] | Sen. Deanna Ballard [R] |
Sen. Kirk deViere [D] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Sen. Gladys Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H580 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Health and Human Services
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S636 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S636v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S636v1.pdf |