NC S678 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-02 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-02 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Summary
Establish Physician Assistant Scholarships.
Title
Establish Physician Assistant Scholarships.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Apodaca [R] | Sen. Peter Brunstetter [R] | Sen. James Forrester [R] | Sen. John Snow [D] |
Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-04-27 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-04-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S678 |