NC S678 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Debt Collection Statutes
Title
Amend Debt Collection Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-07-20 - House - A1 Szoka Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-07-20 - House - A1 Szoka Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | Ch. SL 2015-177 | |
2015-08-05 | Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015 | |
2015-07-29 | Pres. To Gov. 07/29/2015 | |
2015-07-28 | Ratified | |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Concurred In H Amend S678v2 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/27/2015 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/23/2015 |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2015 |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Amend |
2015-07-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-07-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-20 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-07-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2015 |
2015-07-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-07-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-07-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-07-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |