NC S684 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex Offender Supervision/Forensic Amendments
Title
Sex Offender Supervision/Forensic Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-307 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-02 | Placed On Cal For 6/6/2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |