NC S689 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-07 - Ch. SL 2011-414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-07 - Ch. SL 2011-414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Congressional Curative
Title
Congressional Curative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-11-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-11-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-11-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-11-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-07 | Ch. SL 2011-414 | |
2011-11-07 | Ratified | |
2011-11-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-11-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-11-07 | Placed On Cal For 11/7/2011 | |
2011-11-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-11-07 | Ref To Com On Redistricting | |
2011-11-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-11-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-11-07 | Placed On Cal For 11/7/2011 | |
2011-11-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-11-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-11-07 | Re-ref Com On Redistricting | |
2011-11-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-02 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |