NC S709 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Energy Jobs Act
Title
Energy Jobs Act
Sponsors
Sen. Austin Allran [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Richard Gunn [R] |
Sen. David Rouzer [R] | Sen. Robert Rucho [R] | Sen. Daniel Soucek [R] | Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-13 - Senate - Motion 11\OVERRIDE VETO (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-18 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - A7 Justice\Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - A6 Bradley\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - A5 Luebke\Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-06-13 - House - A4 LaRoque\Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - A3 Insko\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - A2 Justice\Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - A1 Harrison\Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-18 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - A7 Justice\Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - A6 Bradley\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - A5 Luebke\Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-06-13 - House - A4 LaRoque\Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - A3 Insko\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - A2 Justice\Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - A1 Harrison\Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-05-24 | Placed On Cal For 5/29/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-07-14 | Placed On Cal For 7/25/2011 | |
2011-07-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-07-14 | Rec From Senate | |
2011-07-13 | Veto Overridden | |
2011-07-13 | Placed On Cal For 7/13/2011 | |
2011-06-30 | Vetoed 6/30/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-18 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2011-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-17 | Conf Rpt Rtn To Conf Com | |
2011-06-17 | Conf Rpt Recon/Withdrawn | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-15 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-15 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Amend Adopted 7 | |
2011-06-14 | Amend Adopted 6 | |
2011-06-13 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-13 | Amend Failed 5 | |
2011-06-13 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2011-06-13 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2011-06-13 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-13 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-03 | Re-ref Com On Public Utilities | |
2011-06-03 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-03 | Serial Referral to Commerce and Job Development Striken | |
2011-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-03 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-12 | Ref to the Com on Public Utilities, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-10 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |