NC S720 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
GSC Conforming Amends./2019 Land-Use Changes
Title
GSC Conforming Amends./2019 Land-Use Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Edwards [R] | Sen. Wilfred Wells [R] | Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Paul Newton [R] |
Sen. Sam Searcy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Ch. SL 2020-25 | |
2020-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2020 | |
2020-06-12 | Pres. To Gov. 6/12/2020 | |
2020-06-11 | Ratified | |
2020-06-11 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-10 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2020-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Filed |