NC S730 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-01 - Ch. Res 2021-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-01 - Ch. Res 2021-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Katherine M.R. Bosken, Commissioner of Banks
Title
Katherine M.R. Bosken, Commissioner of Banks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ch. Res 2021-9 |
2021-09-01 | Ratified | |
2021-08-31 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-31 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-26 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-08-25 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/24/2021 |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Banking Comn.
Banks
Chaptered
Commissioner Of Banks
Confirmation
Financial Institutions
General Assembly
Governor
Joint
Public Officials
Ratified
Resolutions
Banking Comn.
Banks
Chaptered
Commissioner Of Banks
Confirmation
Financial Institutions
General Assembly
Governor
Joint
Public Officials
Ratified
Resolutions