NC S803 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement Administrative Changes
Title
Retirement Administrative Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Apodaca [R] | Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Wesley Meredith [R] |
Sen. Richard Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - A3 Moffitt\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A1 Floyd\Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - A3 Moffitt\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A1 Floyd\Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-178 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-26 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Amendment Withdrawn 2 | |
2012-06-26 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-25 | Postponed To 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/25/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-07 | Ref To Com On State Personnel | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-17 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |