NC S821 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Ch. SL 2012-190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Ch. SL 2012-190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Study and Amend Fisheries Laws
Title
Study and Amend Fisheries Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | Ch. SL 2012-190 | |
2012-07-16 | Signed By Gov. 7/16/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-21 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-21 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-20 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-11 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-11 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-21 | Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2012-05-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Filed |