NC S836 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added After Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added After Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Jordan's Law
Title
Jordan's Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added After Judiciary |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Aoc
Appropriations
Budgeting
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Courts
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Family Issues
Judicial Dept.
Named Laws
Public
Women
Appropriations
Budgeting
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Courts
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Family Issues
Judicial Dept.
Named Laws
Public
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
50B | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S836 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S836v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S836v1.pdf |