NC S864 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Ch. SL 2014-32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Ch. SL 2014-32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Yanceyville ATV Use
Title
Yanceyville ATV Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Ch. SL 2014-32 | |
2014-06-26 | Ratified | |
2014-06-25 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-23 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2014-06-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-19 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Filed |