NC S871 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Summary
Use Pre-Stimulus FMAP for MC Hold Harmless.
Title
Use Pre-Stimulus FMAP for MC Hold Harmless.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-05 | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed On Cal For 4/30/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S871 |