NC S98 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Ch. SL 2013-45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Ch. SL 2013-45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Require Pulse Oximetry Newborn Screening
Title
Require Pulse Oximetry Newborn Screening
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. Louis Pate [R] | Sen. Joshua Stein [D] | Sen. John Barefoot [R] |
Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Eugene McLaurin [D] | Sen. Wesley Meredith [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Ch. SL 2013-45 | |
2013-05-08 | Signed by Gov. 5/8/2013 | |
2013-05-02 | Pres. To Gov. 05/03/2013 | |
2013-05-02 | Ratified | |
2013-05-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/01/2013 |
2013-04-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-16 | House | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services |
2013-04-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-11 | Engrossed | |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Health Care |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H105 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate