ND HB1015 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the various divisions under the supervision of the director of the office of management and budget; to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state auditor; to provide an appropriation to North Dakota state university; to provide an appropriation to Dickinson state university; to provide an appropriation to the department of human services; to provide for transfers; to identify grant funding; to create and enact a new subsection to the new section to chapter 40-05 of the North Dakota Century Code as created by section 1 of Senate Bill No. 2166, as approved by the sixty-fifth legislative assembly, relating to property tax incentives granted by a city; to amend and reenact sections 5-02-01.1 and 6-09-15.1, subsection 8 of section 15-10-38 as amended by section 2 of Senate Bill No. 2037, as approved by the sixty-fifth legislative assembly, section 43-26.1-05.1 as created by section 2 of Senate Bill No. 2131, as approved by the sixty-fifth legislative assembly, subsection 7 of section 47-02-27.4 as created by section 1 of House Bill No. 1228, as approved by the sixty-fifth legislative assembly, and sections 54-06-04.3 and 57-20-04 of the North Dakota Century Code and subsection 3 of section 8 of House Bill No. 1024, section 21 of Senate Bill No. 2013, and section 23 of Senate Bill No. 2013, as approved by the sixty-fifth legislative assembly, relating to alcohol special event permits, temporary loans to the general fund, the teacher loan forgiveness program, criminal history record checks, exclusions from the statutory rule against perpetuities, state agency publication fees, property tax increase reports, cost reimbursement land sales, an oil and gas valuation study, and effective dates; to repeal section 57-20-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tax certifications; to suspend section 54-35-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the tribal and state relations committee; to provide for the administration of the tobacco prevention and control trust fund; to provide exemptions; to provide statements of legislative intent; to provide for legislative management studies; to provide for a legislative management tribal taxation issues committee; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide for a budget section report; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The tribal and state relations committee; to provide for the administration of the tobacco prevention and control trust fund; to provide exemptions; to provide statements of legislative intent; to provide for legislative management studies; to provide for a legislative management tribal taxation issues committee; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide for a budget section report; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/02 |
2017-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 9, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Holmberg Wardner Heckaman |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference committee appointed Delzer Carlson Mock |
2017-04-26 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-04-26 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 54 nays 37 |
2017-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 3 3 |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |