ND HB1060 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new subdivisions to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks requested by the department of commerce for volunteers and employees providing services through the department and by the state court administrator for guardians ad litem.
Title
Criminal history record checks requested by the department of commerce for volunteers and employees providing services through the department and by the state court administrator for guardians ad litem.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 18 |
2017-04-07 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 1 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:50 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |