ND HB1114 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-18.2-05 and 15.1-18.2-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the expansion of the teacher support program to provide mentoring to all first- and second-year teachers in the state.
Title
The expansion of the teacher support program to provide mentoring to all first- and second-year teachers in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 71 |
2021-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 18 1 2 |
2021-01-14 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported back, do pass 12 1 1 |
2021-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |