ND HB1135 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-40.6-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to membership of the emergency services communications coordinating committee.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-40.6-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to membership of the emergency services communications coordinating committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-10 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 10:20 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-16 | Received from House | |
2009-02-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-29 | Rereferred to Political Subdivisions | |
2009-01-28 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-27 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-16 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1135.html |