ND HB1179 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the growth of the state budget.
Title
The growth of the state budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Hoverson [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Scott Dyk [R] | Rep. Donna Henderson [R] |
Rep. Lori VanWinkle [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 21 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 72 |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 03:02 |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |