ND HB1243 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 024 nays 067
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 024 nays 067
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Dever, Hogue A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a child individual income tax credit; to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a child individual income tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Dever, Hogue A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a child individual income tax credit; to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a child individual income tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 024 nays 067 | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 009 | |
2009-02-09 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 001 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1243.html |