ND HB1254 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection
Title
An income tax deduction for retired military personnel pay; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 50 |
2013-02-25 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1254.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0580-01000.pdf |