ND HB1342 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 54-52-02.9, subsection 2 of section 54-52-05, subsection 1 of section 54-52-06, subsection 6 of section 54-52.6-02, subsection 1 of section 54-52.6-09, and subsection 2 of section 54-52.6-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to increased employer and employee contributions under the public employees retirement system defined benefit and defined contribution plans; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.
Title
Increased employer and employee contributions under the public employees retirement system defined benefit and defined contribution plans; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 57 |
2021-02-19 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |