ND HB1474 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring members of the legislative assembly to live in the district from which selected.
Title
Requiring members of the legislative assembly to live in the district from which selected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 76 |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |