ND HB1505 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 23-07-17.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a prohibition on requiring a vaccination; and to provide a penalty.
Title
A prohibition on requiring a vaccination; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Cole Christensen [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Doug Larsen [R] |
Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 60 |
2023-02-13 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 03:53 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-20 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2023-01-20 | House | Request return from committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |