ND SB2025 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of veterans' affairs; to provide for a report; and to provide an exemption.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of veterans' affairs; to provide for a report; and to provide an exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-08 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 1 2 |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |