ND SB2031 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 15-18.2-06.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a higher education funding formula minimum amount payable; to amend and reenact subdivision k of subsection 1 of section 15-18.2-02 and sections 15-18.2-03 and 15-18.2-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the higher education funding formula; to repeal section 15-18.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the institutional size factor of the higher education funding formula; to provide for a study; to provide for a report; and to provide legislative intent.
Title
The institutional size factor of the higher education funding formula; to provide for a study; to provide for a report; and to provide legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |