ND SB2107 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study relating to statutory provisions that prohibit certain individuals from possessing a firearm.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study relating to statutory provisions that prohibit certain individuals from possessing a firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77 |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-26 | Senate | New conference committee appointed Larson Myrdal Paulson |
2023-04-25 | House | New conference committee appointed Satrom S. Olson Heinert |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee dissolved |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 36 nays 11 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Conference committee appointed Klemin Karls Cory |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Larson Myrdal Paulson |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 64 nays 23 |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported back without recommendation 18 3 2 |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee Hearing 08:55 |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-30 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-03-30 | House | Amendment adopted |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 1 0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:10 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:19 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |