ND SB2198 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce for a nursing workforce recruitment and retention grant program.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce for a nursing workforce recruitment and retention grant program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] |
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 4 2 0 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |