ND SB2233 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 48-01.2-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the public opening of subcontractor bids; and to provide for a legislative management study of public improvement issues relating to use of multiple bids versus single prime bids, bidding thresholds, design services thresholds, and indemnification.
Title
The public opening of subcontractor bids; and to provide for a legislative management study of public improvement issues relating to use of multiple bids versus single prime bids, bidding thresholds, design services thresholds, and indemnification.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/15 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2015-04-10 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-02 | House | Conference committee appointed Beadle Louser Boschee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Campbell Poolman Murphy |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 52 nays 39 |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 1 |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |