ND SB2256 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 16.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to election observers.
Title
Election observers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01 | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by Governor 04/01 | |
2011-03-31 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-23 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-22 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 | |
2011-03-18 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 | |
2011-02-11 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-27 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |