ND SB2271 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 4-01-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a pipeline restoration and reclamation oversight program; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A pipeline restoration and reclamation oversight program; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] |
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Concurred |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-06 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2015-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 2 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-24 | House | Amendment adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 0 |
2015-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 8, Emergency clause carried |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |