ND SCR4005 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the Director of the United States Mint to issue commemorative silver and gold coins to commemorate Theodore Roosevelt and the opening of the Theodore Roosevelt Presidential Library.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the Director of the United States Mint to issue commemorative silver and gold coins to commemorate Theodore Roosevelt and the opening of the Theodore Roosevelt Presidential Library.
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Jim Roers [R] | Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] |
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/09 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 11 0 3 |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions |
2023-02-01 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |