NE LB371 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit an individual under nineteen years of age or under twenty-one years of age from being present at a drag show as prescribed
Title
Prohibit an individual under nineteen years of age or under twenty-one years of age from being present at a drag show as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023 |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Hunt AM219 filed |
2023-02-02 | Legislature | Hunt AM206 filed |
2023-02-02 | Legislature | Hunt AM178 filed |
2023-02-02 | Legislature | Hunt AM204 filed |
2023-01-25 | Legislature | Murman AM67 filed |
2023-01-25 | Legislature | Hunt AM74 filed |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Hunt MO4 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Section 3(f) filed |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |