NE LB50 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to medicaid covered services
Title
Change provisions relating to medicaid covered services
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Scheer MO5 prevailed |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Scheer MO5 Withdraw bill filed |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |