NE LB50 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change voice analysis examiner and voice stress analyzer provisions under the Licensing of Truth and Deception Examiners Act
Title
Change voice analysis examiner and voice stress analyzer provisions under the Licensing of Truth and Deception Examiners Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Rereferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |