NE LB52 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change motorcycle helmet provisions and require eye protection
Title
Change motorcycle helmet provisions and require eye protection
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-02-17 | Bloomfield name added | |
2011-02-15 | Karpisek name added | |
2011-02-01 | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2011 | |
2011-01-24 | Larson name added | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12197 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB52.pdf |