NE LB52 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change employment provisions for persons committed to the Department of Correctional Services
Title
Change employment provisions for persons committed to the Department of Correctional Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-27 | Legislature | Laid over |
2013-02-27 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO17 pending |
2013-02-27 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO17 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA15 adopted |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA15 filed |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO16 failed |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO16 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO15 failed |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO15 Reconsider the vote taken on FA14 filed |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA14 lost |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA14 filed |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO12 failed |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO12 pending |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO12 Reconsider the vote taken on FA8 filed |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA8 lost |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA8 filed |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO11 failed |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO11 pending |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO11 Reconsider the vote taken on FA7 filed |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA7 lost |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA7 filed |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Christensen FA6 adopted |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Judiciary AM157 adopted |
2013-02-13 | Legislature | Christensen FA6 pending |
2013-02-13 | Legislature | Christensen FA6 filed |
2013-02-13 | Legislature | Judiciary AM157 pending |
2013-02-08 | Legislature | Judiciary AM157 filed |
2013-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM157 |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2013 |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18177 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB52.pdf |