NE LB533 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require liability insurance for and restrict locations of underground enhanced recovery injection wells and wastewater disposal wells
Title
Require liability insurance for and restrict locations of underground enhanced recovery injection wells and wastewater disposal wells
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31306 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB533.pdf |