NH HB1129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 222; eff.01/15/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 222; eff.01/15/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority to vote by proxy in a condominium association.
Title
Relative to the authority to vote by proxy in a condominium association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 222; eff.01/15/2025 |
2024-07-02 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1693s (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 4 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1693s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Innis Floor Amendment # 2024-1693s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved to Remove HB 1129 from the Consent Calendar; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0871h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0871h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0871h 03/20/2024 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 5 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2024 01:15 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2024 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |