NH HB1248 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Filiault): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 363-11 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Filiault): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 363-11 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to restrictions on access to abortion.
Title
Relative to restrictions on access to abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 363 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Filiault): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 363-11 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 27 |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/18/2024 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 01:30 pm State House Reps Hall |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary |