NH HB1274 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-03 - House Print Debate in Permanent Journal (Rep Hess): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 158-201; House Journal 15, PG.708-710
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-03 - House Print Debate in Permanent Journal (Rep Hess): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 158-201; House Journal 15, PG.708-710
Summary
Restoring moneys for revenue sharing to cities and towns.
Title
Restoring moneys for revenue sharing to cities and towns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | House Print Debate in Permanent Journal (Rep Hess): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 158-201; House Journal 15, PG.708-710 | |
2010-02-03 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-172; House Journal 15, PG.694-696 | |
2010-01-27 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 3 Regular Calendar (vote 11-8); House Calendar 11, PG.469 | |
2010-01-05 | House Executive Session: 1/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-01-05 | House Full Committee Work Session: 1/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 6, PG.234 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2020&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |